THE POLO CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance to professional or former professional polo players. Education and training for alternative employment or self-employment of professional or former professional players. Assistance towards the welfare of ponies. Encouragement of polo amongst children and the young in full time education. Encouragement amongst members of the Armed Services. Donations to other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 1992: Standard registration
- THE COWDRAY PARK POLO CHARITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
General Sir CHARLES REDMOND WATT | Chair | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rose Vestey | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Arthur Henry Lascelles Lucas | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Talbot Rice KC | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Ian Vere Nicoll | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MCFARLAND TINSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.28k | £55.15k | £43.58k | £49.14k | £58.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.43k | £49.95k | £138.77k | £37.01k | £64.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10/12/1992 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/12/1992 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/10/2010
Charitable objects
(A)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY OR INJURY AMONGST POLO PLAYERS AND OTHERS ENGAGED IN PROFESSIONAL POLO ACTIVITIES (B)THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR ALTERNATIVE EMPLOYMENT OR SELF-EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL OR FORMER PROFESSIONAL POLO PLAYERS AND OTHERS ENGAGED OR FORMERLY ENGAGED IN PROFESSIONAL POLO ACTIVITIES (C)THE RELIEF OF POLO PONIES IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION DUE TO ABUSE SICKNESS OR INJURY (D)THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE THE PLAYING OF POLO AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE IN FULL-TIME EDUCATION AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR COLLEGE OF FURTHER EDUCATION OR WHO HAVING LEFT SCHOOL HAVE SECURED A PLACE AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR COLLEGE OF FURTHER EDUCATION THEREBY ASSISTING TO ENSURE THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PERSONS AS WELL AS TO THE OCCUPATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR MINDS (E)THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMED FORCES BY ENABLING AND ENCOURAGING THE PLAYING OF POLO AMONGST MEMBERS THEREOF (F)FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hurlingham Polo Association
Park Farm
Akeman Street,Kirtlington
KIDLINGTON
Oxfordshire
OX5 3JQ
- Phone:
- 01367242829
- Email:
- enquiries@hpa-polo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window