NORTH EAST LONDON ADVOCACY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NELA provides advocacy for people with learning disabilities and mental health problems. NELA helps to protect the rights of people who are disadvantaged and/or vulnerable. Also empowers and encourages people to strive for their basic human rights.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
- Islington
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 23 December 1992: Standard registration
- 14 September 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NELA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £371.00k | £236.88k | £233.63k | £251.16k | £239.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £347.95k | £232.71k | £222.52k | £228.10k | £255.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | 20 June 2011 | 51 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 17 March 2010 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 26 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 20 March 2009 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 31 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH DECEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 29 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT OR WORKING IN NORTH EAST LONDON WHO HAVE LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE RECOVERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS, OR WHO ARE PHYSICALLY DISABLED, BY THE PROVISION OF A SERVICE CALCULATED TO (1)ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO OBTAIN THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS CITIZENS AND (11)PROVIDE ADVOCATES FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window