THE OAKDALE JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1015931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

OAKDALE JUNIORS PTA HOLDS A NUMBER OF FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES THROUGHOUT THE SCHOOL YEAR FOR THE PUPILS WHO ATTEND OAKDALE JUNIOR SCHOOL AND THEIR FAMILIES. WITH THE MONEY RAISED FROM THESE ACTIVITIES OAKDALE JUNIORS PTA PROVIDE EQUIPMENT AND OTHER FUNDING TO ENHANCE AND SUPPORT THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN WHO ATTEND THE SCHOOL.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £10,758
Total expenditure: £11,313

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Redbridge

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 January 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF OAKDALE JUNIOR SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JESSICA AANENSEN Trustee 01 December 2023
None on record
Clare Michele Dibble Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.00k £12.69k £6.56k £6.89k £10.76k
Total expenditure £19.89k £13.48k £9.97k £11.75k £11.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 April 2021 276 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Oakdale Junior School
Oakdale Road
LONDON
E18 1JX
Phone:
02089897471