RAINBOW PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The playgroup offers a wide range of play based learning activities for pre school children. These range from seasonal activities, indoor & outdoor play, multi-cultural learning, home-life, construction, art & craft.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income includes £28,196 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 22 December 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Lewis | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annette Brasier | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA FARROW | Trustee | 01 July 2006 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pipes | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.44k | £32.10k | £27.88k | £44.02k | £28.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.41k | £27.87k | £32.05k | £31.12k | £31.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £28.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 July 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 July 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2022 | 314 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2022 | 314 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 April 2022 | 669 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 April 2022 | 669 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A SAFE ENVIRONMENT FOR CHILDREN FROM TWO AND A HALF TO PRE-SCHOOL AGE TO PLAY AND LEARN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Benjamin Adlard Cp School
Sandsfield Lane
GAINSBOROUGH
Lincolnshire
DN21 1DB
- Phone:
- 07976393746
- Email:
- rainbowplaygroup2@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window