OSWESTRY DAY-CARE CENTRE PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISE FUNDS FOR EQUIPMENT OR BUILDINGS TO HELP GROUPS OF THE ELDERLY OR DISABLED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 08 January 1993: Standard registration
- 31 March 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DAYCARE CENTRE AT FAIRHOLME (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £93 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.12k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APRIL 1992 AS AMENDED 25 NOVEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
(A)PROVIDE A DAY-CARE CENTRE AT FAIRHOLME, MORDA ROAD, OSWESTRY. (B) TO PROVIDE DAY-CARE AND STIMULATION FOR ELDERLY AND DISABLED PEOPLE OF THE AREA
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF OSWESTRY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window