THE FRIENDS OF DAME TIPPING SCHOOL

Charity number: 1015996
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2005

Total income: £2,425
Total expenditure: £1,748

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Havering

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 December 1992: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2004 31/07/2005
Total gross income £2.61k £2.42k
Total expenditure £4.66k £1.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2005 30 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2004 16 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 Not Required