THE NORTH LONDON YOUTH SAILING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports dinghy sailing for children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 December 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN PHILIP WILLIAMS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stewart Keep | Trustee | 06 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Steve Mitchell | Trustee | 06 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Foley | Trustee | 06 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JAMES MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.31k | £6.43k | £13.49k | £6.80k | £5.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.46k | £6.30k | £4.87k | £22.57k | £6.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2024 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 10TH DECEMBER 1992.
Charitable objects
TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PUPILS OF SCHOOLS AND PLACES OF FURTHER EDUCATION AND YOUTH TRAINING IN THOSE LONDON BOROUGHS AND THEIR ADJACENT AREAS WHICH ARE NORTH OF THE RIVER THAMES, TO LEARN AND UNDERTAKE SAILING AND ALLIED ACTIVITIES AND THEREBY TO ASSIST IN ASSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS.
Area of benefit
THOSE LONDON BOROUGHS AND THEIR ADJACENT AREAS NORTH OF THE RIVER THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
75 GREENHAM ROAD
LONDON
N10 1LN
- Phone:
- 02084446374
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window