MARLOW COMMON WOMENS INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 08 January 1993: Standard registration
- 30 April 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- MARLOW COMMON W I (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.59k | £4.26k | £3.43k | £3.12k | £3.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.01k | £4.14k | £3.34k | £2.92k | £3.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 12 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 20 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 06 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 22 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 24 February 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE TO WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION, AND PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MARLOW,MARLOW COMMON,BOVINGDON GREEN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window