Accounts and annual returns TAKE AND PLAY TOY LENDING LIBRARY

Charity number: 1016066
Charity reporting is overdue by 1744 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 283 days
Accounts and TAR 28 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 283 days
Annual return 28 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 649 days
Accounts and TAR 28 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 649 days
Annual return 28 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1014 days
Accounts and TAR 28 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1014 days
Annual return 28 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1379 days
Accounts and TAR 28 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1379 days
Annual return 28 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1744 days
Accounts and TAR 28 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1744 days