Trustees IGHTHAM WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1016098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Elizabeth Williams Chair 10 May 2023
None on record
Jane Teresa Nolan Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Lorraine Rosemary Richardson Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Veronica Elizabeth Clewley Trustee 10 May 2022
None on record
Christina Georgina Edwards Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Moyra McDonald Pickering Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Judith Elizabeth Bradshaw Trustee 08 May 2018
None on record
Helen Rebecca Johnson Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record