ROSANNA HOSPITAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BUILD & MAINTAIN ROSANNA HOSPITAL IN KURDISTAN N IRAQ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2013
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Iraq
Governance
- 08 January 1993: Standard registration
- KURDISTAN RECONSTRUCTION ORGANISATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVINA HUNT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DR FIRIAD HIWAIZA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD CURLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIAMUND BANNA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2009 | 30/11/2010 | 30/11/2011 | 30/11/2012 | 30/11/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.73k | £2.70k | £2.46k | £1.18k | £1.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.39k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 597 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 597 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 962 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 962 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1327 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1327 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1692 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1692 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 DECEMBER 1992 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 2 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE NEED,HARDSHIP,SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF IRAQI KURDISTAN
Area of benefit
IRAQI KURDISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Folly House
Market Square
BAMPTON
OX18 2JH
- Phone:
- 01993852731
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window