HINCKLEY HOMELESS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hinckley Homeless Group runs Lawrence House, a supported accommodation project for homeless young people in the Hinckley & Bosworth area of Leicestershire, plus a semi-supported Move-on House. We provide accommodation for 15 people between the ages of 16 and 26 of either sex. Residents can stay in each accommodation for up to 24 months. We provide support for young people with low-medium needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 12 January 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANA MORGAN | Chair | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Imison | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Ennis Render | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Wightman | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Ann Pendlebury | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER TRICKETT | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN JOHN MORGAN | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.27k | £265.52k | £264.05k | £268.80k | £303.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.43k | £243.25k | £231.01k | £264.46k | £271.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.81k | £6.75k | £8.00k | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 APRIL 1992 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 28 OCTOBER 1992 as amended on 09 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
The relief of those in need by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage, in particular but not exclusively, by providing accommodation and support for homeless young people with a view to helping them resettle in independent accommodation and fulfil their potential.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lawrence House
Wood Street
HINCKLEY
LE10 1JQ
- Phone:
- 01455890688
- Email:
- info@hinckleyhomeless.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window