Financial history NOVEMBER CLUB

Charity number: 1016172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £169.54k £177.57k £235.28k £193.71k £237.37k
Total expenditure £194.31k £169.04k £234.52k £183.42k £183.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £117.18k £24.00k £14.72k £122.61k £139.33k