Financial history TRINITY COLLEGE SCHOOL FOUNDATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity Number: 1016191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £20.27k £7.70k £9.76k £4.79k £6.81k
Total expenditure £36.49k £1.18k £15.85k £813 £979
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A