Financial history DARTFORD FAIRFIELD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1016211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.57k £101 £1.05k £4.34k £4.23k
Total expenditure £3.83k £276 £2.45k £3.26k £3.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A