CHINNOR AND PRINCES RISBOROUGH RAILWAY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To collect, preserve, restore and operate as a permanent public exhibition and display for the advancement of technical, historical and general education and the demonstration of steam and other railway locomotives, rolling stock, equipment, machinery and relics of historical operations and general interest and educational value with particular reference to the former Great Western Railway.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
255 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 15 January 1993: Standard registration
- C & P R R A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stanley Leonard Hart | Chair | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jim Henderson | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin John Satchell | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles Maynard | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Soughton | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Paul Townsend | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Stewart Ogilvie | Trustee | 29 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Woodward | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMIE MARCUS GOODMAN | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Growcott | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.11k | £96.75k | £211.71k | £244.39k | £296.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.70k | £172.88k | £140.43k | £182.26k | £231.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.25k | £11.58k | £25.58k | £7.88k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 9 DECEMBER 1992 AND 7 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
A) TO PRESERVE RESTORE AND OPERATE AS A PERMANENT EXHIBITION AND MUSEUM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF TECHNICAL HISTORICAL AND GENERAL EDUCATION AND FOR THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION DISPLAY AND DEMONSTRATION OF STEAM AND OTHER RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES ROLLING STOCK EQUIPMENT MACHINERY AND RELICS OF HISTORICAL OPERATIONS AND GENERAL INTEREST AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE FORMER GREAT WESTERN RAILWAY. B) TO COLLECT COLLATE EXCHANGE MAKE AVAILABLE FOR PUBLIC REFERENCE AND PUBLISH INFORMATION CONCERNING THE HISTORY EQUIPMENT AND OPERATION OF THE FORMER GREAT WESTERN AND OTHER RAILWAYS. C) TO UNDERTAKE SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES OF AN EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE NATURE AS MAY IN THE OPINION OF THE COMPANY BE CONVENIENTLY OR ADVANTAGEOUSLY UNDERTAKEN IN CONNECTION WITH THE FOREGOING OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE OXON AND BUCKS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Orchard Barn
Ilmer
PRINCES RISBOROUGH
Buckinghamshire
HP27 9RA
- Phone:
- 07825755075
- Email:
- cosec@chinnorrailway.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window