Financial history FRIENDS OF LEEDSTOWN SCHOOL

Charity number: 1016239
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £2.60k £2.77k £12.08k £3.72k £2.87k
Total expenditure £3.58k £2.17k £10.99k £5.08k £3.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A