KEEVIL AND DISTRICT WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1016257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide women with educational opportunities and the chance to build new skills, to take part in a wide variety of activities and to campaign on issues that matter to them and their communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,410
Total expenditure: £1,447

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 January 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KEEVIL AND DISTRICT W I (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janice Maskrey Chair 08 March 2017
None on record
Elizabeth Helen Tyler Trustee 10 March 2021
None on record
Gillian Gosling Trustee 09 April 2014
THE KEEVIL CLUB AND INSTITUTE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.33k £662 £290 £430 £1.41k
Total expenditure £1.14k £477 £411 £778 £1.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WI HOUSE
17 COUCH LANE
DEVIZES
WILTSHIRE
SN10 1EB
Phone:
01380739340
Website:

No information available