BRITISH INSTITUTE FOR GEOLOGICAL CONSERVATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the conservation of Britain's geological heritage, especially the network of SSSIs. Getting ownership of vulnerable sites through purchase via external grants or through transfer of ownership. Developing a Geoheritage Trail in the South Wales Coalfield to promote awareness of the importance of geology among the wider public. To liaise with other European geoconervation organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £169,628 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 January 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF MICHAEL J BENTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Sarah Caroline King | Trustee | 16 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS HOSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KEVIN PAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER J CLEAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JOHN DEHANE MACADAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.84k | £111.30k | £105.71k | £125.36k | £172.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.75k | £8.27k | £51.35k | £140.31k | £89.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.81k | £16.27k | £92.37k | £124.27k | £169.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 DECEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
1)TO PROMOTE OR DEVELOP FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PURSUIT OF GEOLOGICAL CONSERVATION 2)TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO GEOLOGICAL CONSERVATION AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
131 CRAVEN ROAD
NEWBURY
RG14 5NN
- Phone:
- 02920573310
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window