Accounts and annual returns DARLINGTON AFTERNOON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1016341
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 23 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 11 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2005 30 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 31 May 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required