WESTMESTON PARISH ROOM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The village/parish hall is let out regularly to kindergarten; yoga; embroiders guild; local band; Quakers. It is used as an excellent "awayday" venue, by local councils and organisations. It is also let for local weddings, christenings and funerals. It is a voting station.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 January 1993: Standard registration
- WESTMESTON PARISH HALL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ROB MILLS | Chair |
|
||||||
Roderick Pryde OBE | Trustee | 27 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
TESSA MARIE HAUGHTON | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Cathy Mills | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUDY MOODY-STUART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL CHARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.33k | £20.54k | £19.90k | £13.13k | £12.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.58k | £18.17k | £15.73k | £19.30k | £26.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH. MARCH 1992 AND AMENDED 12TH FEBRUARY 1998. as amended on 18 Sep 2018 as amended on 18 Sep 2018 as amended on 03 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF A PARISH ROOM TO BE HELD UPON CHARITABLE TRUSTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WESTMESTON IN THE COUNTY OF SUSSEX.
Area of benefit
WESTMESTON, SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOOKS ACRE
LEWES ROAD
WESTMESTON
HASSOCKS
BN6 8RH
- Phone:
- 01273843936
- Email:
- tessahaughton@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window