TUNE-UP CHARITABLE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of small grants and loans to widows and others connected to the Tune-Up "family" in times of need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 January 1993: Standard registration
- 06 February 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- THE GUINNESS TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £579 | £769 | £275 | £260 | £221 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.80k | £900 | £800 | £800 | £800 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 15 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND DECEMBER 1992, AS AMENDED BY A DEED OF VARIATION DATED 21 JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES ENGAGED IN THE EMPLOYMENT OF OR ACTING AS SELF-EMPLOYED LICENSED OPERATORS OF TUNE-UP LIMITED AND ITS SUBSIDIARY AND ASSOCIATED COMPANIES AND THE WIVES,WIDOWS,CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS BEING IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, IN THE SECOND CASE, THE USE OF FUNDS FOR THE RELIEF OF ANY INDIVIDUAL OR GROUP OF INDIVIDUALS WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES NEED FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE,IN ORDER TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY AND, IN THE THIRD CASE, THE CONTRIBUTION OF FUNDS TO REGISTERED PUBLIC CHARITIES HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS TO THOSE CONTINUED IN THIS DEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window