GLOUCESTER AND DISTRICT BRANCH OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Life Long Learning for those no longer in full time employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 25 January 1993: Standard registration
- U3A GLOUCESTER (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JANET ROSEMARY BROADWAY | Chair | 22 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Jeremy John Anthony Furtado | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Dawn Talbot | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Morgan | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Robins | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.86k | £7.14k | £21.48k | £32.75k | £42.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.43k | £7.67k | £22.08k | £33.49k | £42.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JULY 1991` AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2015 AS AMENDED ON 25 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED ON 23 JUL 2018 as amended on 08 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Towpath Road
Hempsted
Gloucester
GL2 5FJ
- Phone:
- 01452 503263
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window