CITY LIGHT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through its staff and volunteers, the Charity works to promote the interests of young people and the well-being of the community in Salford and across the North West of England. It organises and facilitates events and promotes prayer, making contacts both within the Christian church and with those in community groups and local government
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 18 January 1993: Standard registration
- 21 April 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CLT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.12k | £30.70k | £114.70k | £4.84k | £274 | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.37k | £52.00k | £77.90k | £46.60k | £486 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 17 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 10 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 03 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | 03 August 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED MAY 18 1992
Charitable objects
(A)THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (B) ORGANISATION, SPONSORSHIP AND PROMOTION OF INTER- DENOMINATIONAL CHRISTIAN WORK
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window