WEYMOUTH CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Society are the learning and performance of choral music and to foster public interest and enjoyment of such music by means of public performance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 21 January 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Webb | Chair | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Honeybourne | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
MELODIE BAINES | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Irene Robinson | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP WISE | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINDA IRIS HARDING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.01k | £6.82k | £11.16k | £14.34k | £20.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.65k | £9.75k | £12.60k | £13.83k | £21.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AUGUST 1988, AMENDED 7TH DECEMBER 1992 as amended on 11 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Admirals Quarter
Barrack Road
WEYMOUTH
Dorset
DT4 8BD
- Phone:
- 01305761237
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window