SUNBURY-ON-THAMES WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and training of women
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Surrey
Governance
- 30 January 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Spencer-Edwards | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacquline Elliott | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Mary Draper | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bebe Bond | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Nicholas | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mary Ann Mayell | Trustee | 23 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Endersby | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|||||
MRS GERRY ATTIAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGINA KENNOWAY HOPKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.25k | £1.46k | £3.46k | £3.10k | £3.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.95k | £1.36k | £3.81k | £3.78k | £3.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
SUNBURY-ON-THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUNBURY-ON-THAMES W.I.
C/O MIDDLESEX FEDERATION OF
WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
UNIT 3 7THE GREEN,
WEST DRAYTON, MIDDX.
UB7 7PL
- Phone:
- 01895440161
- Email:
- sunburyonthameswi@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window