TRIANGLE COMMUNITY SERVICES LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the condition of persons of any age with physical disabilities, learning disabilities, and/or mental health problems, by providing a range of quality, flexible and responsive care services to those who need our care and support, and to carers who care for friends and family
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income:
£3,651,451
Donations and legacies | £113.32k | |
Charitable activities | £2.54m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £1.00m |
Total expenditure:
£3,274,144
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.27m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,245,162 from 17 government contract(s) and £9,998 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.27m | |
Retained for future use | £377.31k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
- Surrey
- Sutton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 January 1993: Standard registration
- 10 October 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 10 October 2020: Funds transferred to 226064 FRIENDS OF THE ELDERLY
- DEMENTIA TRAINING AND CONSULTANCY SERVICES (Working name)
- STROKE PROJECT (Working name)
- STROKE SURVIVORS PROJECT (Working name)
- TLC (Working name)
- THE TLC CARE ATTENDANT SERVICE LIMITED (Previous name)
- TLC CARE ATTENDANT SERVICE LIMITED (Previous name)
- TLC CARE SERVICES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.67m | £5.57m | £5.69m | £5.77m | £3.65m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.14m | £5.49m | £5.74m | £6.02m | £3.27m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £4.40m | £4.37m | £4.39m | £4.16m | £1.25m | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £10.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £177.83k | £41.38k | £4.27k | £217.52k | £113.32k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.47m | £5.49m | £5.68m | £5.55m | £2.54m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £19.44k | £39.11k | £0 | £0 | £1.00m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.13m | £5.49m | £5.74m | £6.02m | £3.27m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.43k | £7.47k | £9.56k | £9.24k | £10.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £142.46k | £170.77k | £120.64k | £37.17k | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £739.92k | £686.80k | £1.35m | £1.48m | £0 | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £787.71k | £718.06k | £1.38m | £1.68m | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/12/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/04/2015
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES, FACILITIES AND PRACTICAL ADVICE 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL SERVICES IN THE FIELD OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROVISION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF HACKNEY AND ADJACENT AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window