LEEDS DAYBREAK TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Daybreak offers financial help for people living with HIV/AIDS, who live in Leeds or receive medical services in Leeds. Grants are one off payments and are for specific items, not general living expenses. Cheques are issued in the name of suppliers of goods, not made out to individual patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Leeds City
Governance
- 22 January 1993: Standard registration
- 17 December 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DAYBREAK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £764 | £371 | £763 | £2.06k | £9 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.12k | £2.12k | £1.81k | £2.20k | £1.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 26 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 20 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 03 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 30 May 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 14 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF AND TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELL-BEING OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED AS HIV ANTIBODY POSITIVE AND THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND CARERS OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
CITY OF LEEDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window