Trustees Friends of Glebe Primary
Charity number: 1016577

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Louise Niblock | Chair | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Lianne North | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keeley Johnson | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Fenn | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kym McWhinnie | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Sharman | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Wilkes | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Thompson | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Smith | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Anne Louise Smith | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Collin | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Claire Findlay | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Vivien Larkin | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Berry | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.