Financial history GLORY HOUSE

Charity number: 1016583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £659.08k £601.12k £571.20k £3.87m £512.59k
Total expenditure £702.33k £600.20k £615.02k £1.08m £876.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £100.73k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £633.26k £601.12k £427.95k £797.73k £500.36k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £25.79k £0 £9.54k £10.56k £8.66k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £36 £1 £0 £1.86k £3.58k
Income - Other £0 £0 £133.72k £3.06m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £695.10k £596.05k £612.04k £1.08m £864.48k
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.23k £4.15k £2.98k £0 £11.85k
Expenditure - Governance £6.50k £0 £0 £11.23k £8.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0