Accounts and annual returns DOWNHAM MARKET WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1016586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 18 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required