Trustees DOWNHAM MARKET WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity Number: 1016586

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Smith | Chair | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Beesley | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Davis | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justine Roberts | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Hogger | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Wiseman | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Rae | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Harrigan | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marion Dowling | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ryan | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENEFER TYLER | Trustee | 03 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.