FRIENDS OF ST PHILIP'S

Charity Number: 1016595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Charity is a Parent fund raising organisation for St Philips Roman Catholic Primary School Arundel. Funds raised through School Summer and Christmas Fairs and social events for both parents and children.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £13,868
Total expenditure: £11,630

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 February 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosie Davut Chair 12 October 2024
None on record
Victoria Standing Trustee 12 October 2024
None on record
Emily Waring Trustee 12 October 2024
None on record
Asha Knight Trustee 12 October 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.94k £1.08k £3.82k £1.16k £13.87k
Total expenditure £6.37k £396 £1.41k £3.06k £11.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 29 May 2024 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 13 July 2023 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 May 2022 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 June 2021 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Philips Catholic Primary
London Road
ARUNDEL
West Sussex
BN18 9BA
Phone:
01903882115
Website:

No information available