LAYMEN'S EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Association is to advance the Christian Evangelical Faith and to actively promote and support missionary cause abroad, particularly in developing countries, and for that purpose and in particular without in any way limiting the generality of the foregoing to work for revival in churches and amongst students. We use preaching and teaching of the Word of God, distribution of litera
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Germany
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 February 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DANIEL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev David Alfred Campbell | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Regina Weidenmuller | Trustee | 26 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lily Daniel | Trustee | 30 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHANNES WEIDENMULLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.04k | £144.69k | £161.01k | £184.96k | £210.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.51k | £153.49k | £167.60k | £187.86k | £201.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 7 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 17 SEPTEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELICAL FAITH AND TO ACTIVELY PROMOTE AND SUPPORT MISSIONARY CAUSE ABROAD, PARTICULARLY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AND FOR THAT PURPOSE AND IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO WORK FOR THE REVIVAL IN CHURCHES AND AMONGST STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Brixton Station Road
LONDON
SW9 8PD
- Phone:
- 07742406603
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window