NEWBURY AND DISTRICT BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote and develop beekeeping as a enjoyable and beneficial activity Provide an information service to the public in matters of beekeeping and swarm collection Visit schools and provide educational input on apiculture for the science curriculum" Liaise with national beekeeping authorities in matters of good beekeeping practice, disease control and the environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Oxfordshire
- West Berkshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 25 January 1993: Standard registration
- N D B K A (Working name)
- NEWBURY AND DISTRICT BEEKEEPER'S ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Doyle | Chair | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FROMANT | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hall | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE HORNER | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Roberts | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Tichband | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Greer | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.26k | £9.62k | £15.38k | £13.34k | £19.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.05k | £8.98k | £16.37k | £17.38k | £16.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 20TH. NOVEMBER 1992 AND 17 NOVEMBER 2005 as amended on 17 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE PRACTICE AND SCIENCE OF APICULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NEWBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Paddocks End
Reading Road
Burghfield Common
Reading
Berkshire
RG7 3BH
- Phone:
- 01189834090
- Email:
- kate.m.bessant@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window