NEW BRANCEPETH YOUTH CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Youth Club serves the village of New Brancepeth. Activities are required to have an educational focus and serve to demonstrate for example personal health, social responsibility, financial well-being, community service and personal confidence and esteem. Increasingly emphasis is being placed on the need to provide tuition in basic key board skills so as to enhance future employment prospects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 25 January 1993: Standard registration
- 09 June 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- NEW BRANCEPETH YOUTH CLUB DURHAM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.41k | £2.28k | £4.80k | £4.19k | £5.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.41k | £2.49k | £4.45k | £3.94k | £4.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 13 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JULY 1984
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF TEN AND EIGHTEEN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE OR SEX OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER BELIEF OR OPINIONS THROUGH LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL,MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
NEW BRANCEPETH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window