BAIL WOOD SCOUT CAMP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a camp site for the use of the Scout Movement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 25 January 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN EDWARD SIDDLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ian Stocks | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Robin Blood | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ALAN HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.60k | £21.56k | £11.86k | £3.70k | £4.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.44k | £4.18k | £5.41k | £5.41k | £6.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.96k | £11.04k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 April 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST OF 23 MAY 1982
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF SCOUT CAMPING FACILITIES
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 GLENWOOD CLOSE
HULL
HU8 0ER
- Phone:
- 01482712814
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window