Financial history MEDICAID CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1016633
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2004 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2008 30/06/2009
Total gross income £2.52k £1.26k £1.07k £1.37k £1.21k
Total expenditure £10.80k £136 £2.04k £1.16k £2.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A