Trustees BLAENAVON TOWN BAND

Charity Number: 1016635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNN DAVIES Chair 26 March 2015
None on record
Lauren Mary Jane Churh Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Sharon Lesley James Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Natasha Evans Trustee 12 January 2023
None on record
DAWN MICHELLE WEST Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Angela Langley Trustee 16 June 2018
None on record
Kale Corey Jarrod Church Trustee 28 March 2014
None on record
Joanne Claire Knight Trustee 28 March 2003
None on record
ALAN STYLES Trustee
None on record
JANE HELEN DAVIES Trustee
None on record