DOVETALES INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local Church & community activities from our Centre in Oldham Support of Educational, medical & social projects in India Support Social project in Israel
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oldham
- India
Governance
- 27 January 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BILL HEAP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jeffrey Holloway | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Holloway | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANET AUDREY HEAP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.29k | £8.58k | £10.68k | £11.10k | £14.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.22k | £4.43k | £6.21k | £7.29k | £10.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH JUNE 1992 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23RD DECEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO PREACH AND TEACH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE AND TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF HUMAN SUFFERING AND POVERTY AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND GENERAL SCHOOLING TO THE UNDER PRIVELEGED AND TO PROVIDE TRAINING IN THE GOSPEL AND TO PROVIDE MEDICAL AID AND TO PROVIDE ACCOMODATION FOR THOSE IN NEED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dovetales Christian Centre
5-7 Beal Lane
Shaw
OLDHAM
OL2 8UY
- Phone:
- 01616524060
- Email:
- dovetales7@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window