INTERNATIONAL NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATION TRAINING AND RESEARCH CENTRE

Charity Number: 1016676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

INTRAC works to improve the effectiveness of civil society organization around the world but particularly in the global south. We work with civil society in diverse forms: formal organizations, networks, and informal alliances. We develop practical solutions to the challenges that civil society faces through a combination of values-driven consultancy, training, research and reflection.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire
  • Afghanistan
  • Albania
  • Armenia
  • Bangladesh
  • Belgium
  • Brazil
  • Burkina Faso
  • Cambodia
  • Cameroon
  • Canada
  • China
  • Colombia
  • Czech Republic
  • Denmark
  • Dominican Republic
  • Egypt
  • Estonia
  • Ethiopia
  • France
  • Georgia
  • Germany
  • Ghana
  • Guinea
  • Hungary
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Ireland
  • Israel
  • Italy
  • Jordan
  • Kazakhstan
  • Kenya
  • Kosovo
  • Kyrgyzstan
  • Lebanon
  • Lithuania
  • Macedonia
  • Malaysia
  • Mali
  • Mongolia
  • Montenegro
  • Morocco
  • Nepal
  • Netherlands
  • Niger
  • Nigeria
  • Norway
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Pakistan
  • Philippines
  • Portugal
  • Rwanda
  • Saudi Arabia
  • Senegal
  • Serbia
  • Slovakia
  • Slovenia
  • South Africa
  • South Sudan
  • Sri Lanka
  • Sudan
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • Syria
  • Tanzania
  • Turkey
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • Uzbekistan
  • Vietnam

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • INTRAC (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Yvonne Taylor Chair 05 December 2018
None on record
Sareta Thomas Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Bethany Salmon Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Jane Angela Wanjiru Kanyiha Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Peter John McAllister Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Alison Hilary Marshall Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Ruth Njiri Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Bijay Kumar Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Ashley Ivor Green-Thompson Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Natasha Jamal Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
David-Huw Owen Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Smruti Patel Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record
Charles Kojo VanDyck Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.69m £1.58m £1.89m £1.50m £1.65m
Total expenditure £1.67m £1.67m £1.90m £1.54m £1.43m
Income from government contracts £11.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £260.15k N/A N/A £25.46k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.28k £0 £20.41k £19.76k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £18.33k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.65m £1.56m £1.87m £1.47m £1.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.82k £170 £17 £125 £853
Income - Other £37.67k £5.95k £0 £288 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £20.41k £19.76k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.67m £1.67m £1.90m £1.54m £1.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.40k £7.24k £12.27k £13.99k £9.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £83.62k £70.17k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £6.87k £10.17k £9.19k £0 £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £803.75k £707.97k £673.93k £571.73k £663.03k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£46.83k -£39.52k -£29.52k £0 £0
Total liabilities £359.50k £360.15k £342.85k £306.48k £179.98k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Wheelhouse
Angel Court
81 St. Clements Street
OXFORD
OX4 1AW
Phone:
01865201852