THE INSTITUTE OF PROFESSIONAL SOUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports those working in professional audio in an operational capacity within the media industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Austria
- Denmark
- Ireland
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Portugal
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 28 January 1993: Standard registration
- THE I B S (Working name)
- INSTITUTE OF BROADCAST SOUND (Previous name)
- THE INSTITUTE OF BROADCAST SOUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Carugo | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Banfield | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Curry | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cheffins | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bridges | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Gough | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Griff Hewis | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Clark | Trustee | 13 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN BISHOP MIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN FELTON MIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JOHN WILLETT MIBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR KEITH GRAHAM MIBS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.72k | £48.30k | £47.18k | £56.69k | £88.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.90k | £39.90k | £26.64k | £38.11k | £96.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/12/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/05/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2011 as amended on 03 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT BROADCAST SOUND,AND TO PROMOTE THE CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL BENEFITS RESULTING FROM BROADCASTING SOUND OF HIGH TECHNICAL AND ARTISTIC QUALITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
IPS Secretariat
PO Box 208
Havant
Hampshire
PO9 9BQ
- Phone:
- 03004008427
- Email:
- secretariat@ips.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window