PEWSHAM WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1016734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Monthly meetings with mostly senior members on various Educational and Recreational Subjects

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,478
Total expenditure: £4,801

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 January 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Margaret Hamer Trustee 05 March 2025
None on record
Carolyn Bridge Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Wendy Channing Trustee 04 July 2023
None on record
Linda Giggs Trustee 23 June 2023
None on record
Elisabeth Davies Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Anna Zebedee-Hardy Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Christine Leake Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
HEATHER DIANA TUBEY Trustee 13 July 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.42k £1.33k £1.74k £4.72k £4.48k
Total expenditure £5.61k £2.00k £1.95k £4.36k £4.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Pewsham WI, WFWI
WI House
17 Couch Lane
DEVIZES
Wiltshire
SN10 1EB
Phone:
07875565540
Website:

No information available