HIGHWORTH EVENING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Highworth Evening Women's Institute holds monthly meetings and regularly organises extra activities. It offers the chance to make new friends and have a good time in a supportive environment. It seeks to offer its members the opportunity to develop interests and skills in a wide range of subjects. It supports the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 29 January 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Hooper | Chair | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Watson | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Adele Merrison | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judy Pearson | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Aburrow | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bren Hosking | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Miller | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Swaffield | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Nind | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Bennett-Murdoch | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Crampton | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|||||
JACQUELINE MORTIMER | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.42k | £2.36k | £3.37k | £5.29k | £6.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.47k | £1.46k | £4.01k | £5.20k | £6.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE HIGHWORTH, SEVENHAMPTON, SWINDON & CRICKLADE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WI House
17 Couch Road
Devizes
SN10 1EB
- Phone:
- 01380739340
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window