Trustees LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Charity number: 1016766

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLENICE RITA WIGNALL | Chair | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MANDY CUTLER | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LOBB | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Teresa Eydman | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Heyes | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rita Caves | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Hobbs | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gail Wooliscroft | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET KIRK | Trustee | 20 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WOOLLARD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.