TZEDEK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reduction of extreme poverty in some of the poorest regions of the world using the skills and expertise of the Jewish community and through our youth leadership programmes in UK. We help communities lift themselves out of poverty by working with local organisations in education, youth leadership and livelihoods & by developing the capability & capacity of community organisations to create change.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
- Ghana
- India
Governance
- 28 January 1993: Standard registration
- 23 May 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 23 May 2023: Funds transferred to 290767 THE CENTRAL BRITISH FUND FOR WORLD JEWISH RELIEF
- JEWISH ACTION FOR A JUST WORLD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £371.98k | £492.79k | £440.04k | £276.55k | £247.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £370.13k | £491.52k | £473.09k | £325.70k | £224.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 19/01/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/03/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/03/2011
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DEPRIVATION SICKNESS DISTRESS AND HARDSHIP IN ANY COUNTRY OR COUNTRIES, PLACE OR PLACES WITHOUT DIFFERENTIATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE COLOUR NATIONALITY CREED OR SEX (2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND THE JEWISH COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR CONCERNING THE NATURE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF POVERTY DEPRIVATION SICKNESS DISTRESS AND HARDSHIP AND OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS OBLIGATIONS BELIEFS AND TRADITIONS TO RELIEVE THE SAME AND TO CONDUCT AND PROCURE RESEARCH CONCERNING THESE AND TO PUBLISH OR OTHERWISE MAKE THE RESULTS THEREOF AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window