OLD CATTON EVENING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In line with the WI at national and county level, our monthly meetings for local women feature speakers and activities which entertain, educate and connect. These are supplemented by social outings and smaller groups covering interests such as gardening, crafts, reading, walking and darts. We also run Warm Welcome in Old Catton, on the first and third Tuesday morning of each month.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 02 February 1993: Standard registration
- OLD CATTON EVENING W I (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorna Catherine Brigden | Chair | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Veronika Bartram | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Hare | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irene Greenwood | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Elson | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Colbourne | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shelagh Maple | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Erica Mary Stevens | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.95k | £1.29k | £971 | £2.05k | £2.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.62k | £1.16k | £1.09k | £1.35k | £3.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC. DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS. HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE TO WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION, AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTISE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE OLD CATTON,SPROWSTON,HELLESDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
75 WROXHAM ROAD
NORWICH
Norwich
Norfolk
NR7 8TW
- Phone:
- 07810098684
- Email:
- OCEWI@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window