FRIENDS OF BACTON COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1016866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We organise general charity events eg. fairs, to raise money for the school to spend on equipment or activities for the children.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £6,498
Total expenditure: £1,569

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 January 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF BACTON CP SCHOOL (Working name)
  • H S A (Working name)
  • BACTON COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Donna Hughes Chair 01 September 2023
None on record
SIOBHAN CLAIRE SMITH Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Nicola Hitter Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Gayle Brett Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.61k £319 £2.70k £3.02k £6.50k
Total expenditure £420 £427 £1.12k £1.28k £1.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bacton Primary School
Tailors Green
Bacton
STOWMARKET
Suffolk
IP14 4LL
Phone:
01449781367
Website:

No information available