Redbridge Jewish School Charity

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
King Solomon High School is a voluntary- aided secondary school; its object are to further the education, including religious, social and physical,of children attending the school under the religious direction of the Chief Rabbi and in accordance with the aims of the school by promoting high standards of academic excellence in both Jewish and secular subjects and Jewish beliefs values & traditions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Redbridge
Governance
- 29 January 1993: Standard registration
- KING SOLOMON HIGH SCHOOL REDBRIDGE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Howard Goldstein | Chair | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Elliot Levy | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Collins | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Malca Zinkin | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Saltman | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 29/03/2023 | 29/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.59k | £89.72k | £286.60k | £63.03k | £295.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £325.03k | £74.85k | £303.52k | £142.47k | £139.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 9 DECEMBER 2010. as amended on 08 Nov 2021 as amended on 30 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL (HAVING REGARD TO THE RELIGIOUS GUIDANCE OF THE CHIEF RABBI) AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS OF THE SCHOOL AS DETERMINED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE BOARD, AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE NEVERTHELESS TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY:- (1) PROMOTING HIGH STANDARDS OF ACADEMIC EXCELLENCE IN BOTH JEWISH AND SECULAR SUBJECTS; AND (2) EMPHASIZING JEWISH BELIEFS, VALUES AND TRADITIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Forest Road
Barkingside
Ilford
Ilford
Essex
IG6 3HB
- Phone:
- 0208 498 1300
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window