THE CHURCH OF GOD (PENTECOSTAL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian Religion according to the articles of faith set out in the schedule hereto. The Relief of Poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
- 01 February 1993: Standard registration
- FREEDOM WORSHIP CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Verona Elizabeth M Crossfield | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cindy Lisa Wallace | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Faughnan | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anton Lloyd Wallace | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Smith-Useya | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
LISA FENDER-JACK | Trustee | 31 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev LLOYD DAVID CROSSFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.08k | £116.42k | £178.45k | £190.04k | £154.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.39k | £58.59k | £60.19k | £82.80k | £81.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JANUARY 1993.
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE ARTICLES OF FAITH SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO (II) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND WALES AND JAMAICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Church of God Pentecostal
Western Road
Southall
UB2 5EA
- Phone:
- 02088138005
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window